U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01163
  • Case Name: Lago v. Geico General Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 01, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • October 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • September 21, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • August 19, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 27, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 27, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.