U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01164
  • Case Name: Stavig v. Sumner-Cowley Electric Cooperative, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Administratively Closing Case]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Service]
  • January 23, 2023: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 20, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 18, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • January 16, 2023: [Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • January 16, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 13, 2023: [Comparative Fault Designation]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 14, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 01, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 07, 2022: [Return of Service of Subpoena]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 10, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 07, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • August 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 29, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 24, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • August 24, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 19, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • August 17, 2022: [Alias Summons Issued]
  • August 16, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 09, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • August 05, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • August 05, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • August 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 03, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 27, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 27, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.