U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-04041
  • Case Name: Berggren v. Leiszler Oil Company, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel Arbitration]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 26, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 26, 2022: [Compel Arbitration]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 28, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 28, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.