U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02295
  • Case Name: Woodside Village North, LLC et al v. Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Change of Firm Name or Address]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Change of Firm Name or Address]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 21, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 21, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 31, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 08, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 08, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 08, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • August 01, 2022: [Show Cause]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 28, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 28, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.