U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02291
  • Case Name: Moore v. CA Senior Management, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 28, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 15, 2022: [Stipulation]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • October 28, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 11, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 12, 2022: [Summons Issued]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.