U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-04042
  • Case Name: Nicholson Construction Company v. BCI Construction USA, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 23, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • November 22, 2022: [Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • November 15, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • November 15, 2022: [Comparative Fault Designation]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 14, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Protective Order]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 27, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • September 16, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 06, 2022: [Counterclaim]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • August 23, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 28, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 28, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.