U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02296
  • Case Name: Wisecarver et al v. Sunrise Senior Living Services, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 10, 2022: [Objection(s)]
  • November 09, 2022: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 20, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Remove]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • August 01, 2022: [Show Cause]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 28, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • July 28, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.