U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01166
  • Case Name: Wilson v. Geico Indemnity Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • September 21, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 21, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 08, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 12, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • August 11, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 28, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
  • July 28, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.