U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01165
  • Case Name: United States Department of Labor v. Mr. Cao's LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Joint Mediation Notice]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Protective Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for More Definite Statement]
  • November 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 28, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 27, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 21, 2022: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
  • October 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 11, 2022: [Expediting Briefing Deadline]
  • October 10, 2022: [More Definite Statement]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 20, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 19, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 16, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 03, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 28, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • July 28, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 28, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.