U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02299
  • Case Name: Hajduch v. Rosati's Pizza of Overland Park Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Administratively Closing Case]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 06, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 28, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • July 28, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 28, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.