U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02297
  • Case Name: Hook et al v. NCS, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 03, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • November 15, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 15, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • October 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 28, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • July 28, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 28, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.