U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03153
  • Case Name: Davis (ID 93293) v. Schnurr et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Minute Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Conventionally]
  • January 20, 2023: [PROVISIONALLY SEALED Exhibits]
  • January 20, 2023: [Martinez Report]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Proposed Sealed Record]
  • January 19, 2023: [Leave to File Conventionally]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Waiver]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Complaint]
  • October 18, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 11, 2022: [Amend Complaint]
  • October 07, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address (Prisoner)]
  • August 16, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 08, 2022: [Partial Filing Fee Paid]
  • August 03, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • August 03, 2022: [Show Cause]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • July 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 29, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • July 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.