U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03151
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Montgomery County Jail et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • September 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 06, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
  • July 29, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • July 29, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.