U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02300
  • Case Name: Edwards v. Goldman, Sachs & Co., LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Status Report Order]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 29, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 29, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • August 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 29, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 29, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.