U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03047
  • Case Name: Robinson v. Sedgwick County Jail et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Mail Returned]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • September 21, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • September 16, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 13, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 13, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 02, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 02, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 15, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 11, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 10, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • August 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice Re Pro Se Mailing]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.