U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03154
  • Case Name: Cox (ID 98253) v. Zmuda
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Minute Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [Conventionally Filed Exhibits]
  • January 17, 2023: [Exhibits]
  • January 17, 2023: [Martinez Report]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Conventionally]
  • January 13, 2023: [Leave to File Conventionally]
  • January 13, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 16, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 28, 2022: [Compel]
  • November 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 09, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Waiver of Service Unexecuted - Prisoner Case]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal]
  • October 19, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • October 19, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - Prisoner Case]
  • October 18, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - Prisoner Case]
  • October 07, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • September 09, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 09, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Ruling]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Ruling]
  • August 26, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • August 24, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • August 19, 2022: [Filing Fee Paid]
  • August 10, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Complaint]
  • August 03, 2022: [Amend Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
  • July 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.