U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01167
  • Case Name: Castro Duran v. Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery Hearing]
  • December 28, 2022: [Discovery Hearing]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 20, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 12, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 12, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • August 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 29, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 29, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.