U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02302
  • Case Name: Akins v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 23, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 20, 2023: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • January 20, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 19, 2023: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 19, 2023: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • January 19, 2023: [Show Cause]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 18, 2023: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 18, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • July 31, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 31, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.