U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01168
  • Case Name: Cameron v. Wichita, City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 19, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • January 19, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 19, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 19, 2023: [Leave to Amend Complaint]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 05, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 02, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 29, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 29, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 16, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 16, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 16, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 01, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Produce]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Produce]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 13, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • October 11, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 06, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 06, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 06, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • October 06, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 06, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • August 01, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.