U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02301
  • Case Name: Throgmorton v. Papay et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 17, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 13, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • December 08, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 30, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 21, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • November 17, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • November 16, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • November 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • August 05, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • August 02, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.