U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01169
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Contents of Account No. xxxx1736 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Status Report]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • October 08, 2024: [Stay Case]
  • October 04, 2024: [Status Report]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Status Report]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Claim]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Return of Service]
  • October 13, 2022: [Service by Publication]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Warrant for Arrest of Property]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 01, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 01, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.