U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03164
  • Case Name: Woods v. Atkins et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • October 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
  • September 07, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
  • August 08, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.