U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02315
  • Case Name: Bink v. JMA Railroad Supply Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Administratively Closing Case]
  • December 16, 2022: [ADR Report]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 29, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 18, 2022: [Expert Witness Designation]
  • November 09, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 14, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 11, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 07, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • August 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 10, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 10, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • August 10, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.