U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01176
  • Case Name: Dutcher et al v. USD 259 Wichita et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 07, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Exhibits]
  • September 12, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 09, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • September 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal]
  • August 25, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • August 23, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • August 11, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 10, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 10, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.