U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01177
  • Case Name: Pflughoeft v. Kansas & Oklahoma Railroad, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 06, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • November 09, 2022: [Third Party Complaint]
  • November 07, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 06, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Setting Scheduling Conference]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 23, 2022: [More Definite Statement]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • September 22, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 09, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 08, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 08, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 08, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 11, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 11, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 10, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 10, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 10, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.