U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-04043
  • Case Name: Rexwinkle v. Coffeyville Regional Medical Center, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 02, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 11, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Courtroom Change]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • August 12, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • August 11, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 11, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.