U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02316
  • Case Name: Kaszko v. RSH & Associates LLC et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 12, 2023: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • January 04, 2023: [ADR Report]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • December 26, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • December 26, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • December 07, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • December 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2022: [Judgment Offer Accepted]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 22, 2022: [Third Party Complaint]
  • November 16, 2022: [Third Party Complaint]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • November 14, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 03, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 02, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 05, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 03, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Consent to Mediation]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • August 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 29, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 18, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2022: [State Court Records]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 12, 2022: [State Court Records]
  • August 11, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • August 11, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 11, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • August 11, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 10, 2022: [State Court Records]
  • August 10, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.