U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03167
  • Case Name: Collins v. Woods
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Mail Returned]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ]
  • August 26, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 26, 2022: [Petition]
  • August 25, 2022: [Writ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • August 22, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 22, 2022: [Complaint]
  • August 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 12, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
  • August 11, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.