U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02317
  • Case Name: Delap v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 23, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • December 05, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • December 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • November 23, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • November 15, 2022: [Show Cause]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 11, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • August 11, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.