U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02318
  • Case Name: Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. UnitedLex Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • August 12, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 11, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 11, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.