U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02320
  • Case Name: Flummerfelt v. Scheels All Sports, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 05, 2022: [Reply]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • September 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 16, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 16, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Out of Time]
  • September 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 15, 2022: [Leave to File Out of Time]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 31, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Complaint]
  • August 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 28, 2022: [Amend Complaint]
  • August 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 15, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 12, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 12, 2022: [State Court Records]
  • August 12, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.