U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03168
  • Case Name: Price v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Mandate]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order of 10CCA]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [Appeal Number Information]
  • September 29, 2022: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 29, 2022: [Appeal Filing Fee Waived/Not Paid]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • September 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • September 09, 2022: [Supplement]
  • September 07, 2022: [Supplement]
  • September 02, 2022: [Affidavit]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • August 24, 2022: [Leave]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 12, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.