U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01178
  • Case Name: Newlin v. D.L.C., Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Expert Witness Designation]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 29, 2022: [Comparative Fault Designation]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 25, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Docket Text Modification]
  • September 23, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 06, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • September 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • August 18, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • August 16, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • August 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 15, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 15, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.