U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01179
  • Case Name: Prince v. Walmart, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 19, 2022: [Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 09, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • September 08, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 08, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • September 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • August 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 15, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 15, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.