U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02276
  • Case Name: Garcia Valdez v. Signature Landscape, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 06, 2025: [Extension of Time]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • April 08, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 01, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 31, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 13, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 11, 2025: [Supplement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Expediting Briefing Deadline]
  • March 11, 2025: [Leave to Amend Complaint]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Consent to Join]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 24, 2023: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 24, 2023: [Partial Summary Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Consent to Join]
  • November 18, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Consent to Join]
  • November 14, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 28, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 21, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 05, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 27, 2022: [Certify Class]
  • September 26, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 22, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Consent to Join]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Consent to Join]
  • September 07, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.