U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02137
  • Case Name: Legleiter v. Rush County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 02, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [ADR Report]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • October 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • September 23, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • September 21, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • September 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 19, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 19, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.