U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01187
  • Case Name: King of Freight LLC v. Viva Express, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 27, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 14, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 14, 2022: [Set Aside]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • November 02, 2022: [Certified Mail Receipt Returned]
  • November 01, 2022: [Leave]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 21, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • October 20, 2022: [Application for Clerks Entry of Default]
  • October 20, 2022: [SEALED Exhibits]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal]
  • October 14, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 14, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • August 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 19, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 19, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 19, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • August 19, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.