U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02330
  • Case Name: Davis v. Males et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 01, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 25, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 25, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 25, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice Re Pro Se Mailing]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 22, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 22, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 22, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 09, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 09, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 26, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • October 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 24, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • October 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 19, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • August 19, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 19, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.