U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03174
  • Case Name: Owens v. Payne
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 05, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Traverse]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge]
  • October 14, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • August 19, 2022: [Filing Fee Paid]
  • August 19, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.