U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03173
  • Case Name: Hudgins (ID 103385) v. Schnurr
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 04, 2023: [Dismiss]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • December 27, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 27, 2022: [State Court Records]
  • December 27, 2022: [Response to Order]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • September 26, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • September 26, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Filing Fee Paid]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Show Cause - Prisoner Case]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
  • August 19, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.