U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02332
  • Case Name: Haynes v. VANCE & HUFFMAN, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • August 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 19, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 19, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.