U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02331
  • Case Name: Roadbuilders Machinery Supply Co., Inc. v. Sandvik Mining and Construction USA, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Unsealing of Provisionally Sealed Document]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 20, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • December 14, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Objection(s)]
  • December 01, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 22, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 14, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 11, 2022: [Protective Order]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • October 14, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 13, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 26, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • August 22, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • August 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 19, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • August 19, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 19, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.