U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03175
  • Case Name: Gorbey v. Doe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order of 10CCA]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order of 10CCA]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Appeal Number Information]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • October 17, 2022: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • October 17, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • October 04, 2022: [Appeal Number Information]
  • October 03, 2022: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • October 03, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • September 20, 2022: [Record on Appeal Retrieved by 10CCA]
  • September 19, 2022: [Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge]
  • September 19, 2022: [Recusal]
  • September 19, 2022: [Hearing]
  • September 08, 2022: [Appeal Number Information]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • September 06, 2022: [Appeal Filing Fee Waived/Not Paid]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • August 22, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • August 22, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • August 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.