U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01188
  • Case Name: Sturm et al v. Cude et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Service]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • January 12, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Return of Service of Subpoena]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 01, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • October 21, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 21, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 22, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 22, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 22, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.