U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03176
  • Case Name: Tallie v. Crawford, County of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • January 23, 2023: [Minute Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [Terminating Referral Judge]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Show Cause]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 03, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • September 12, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
  • August 23, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.