U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02334
  • Case Name: Santoyo v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 06, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order]
  • October 10, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • September 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.