U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01192
  • Case Name: Haley v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 05, 2022: [Social Security - Plaintiffs Initial Brief]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Social Security Administrative Record]
  • October 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • August 24, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 23, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • August 23, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 23, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
  • August 23, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.