U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01191
  • Case Name: Puetz v. Pryor et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 04, 2023: [Reassigning Case]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 28, 2022: [Vacate]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • October 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 23, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 23, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • August 23, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 23, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.