U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01190
  • Case Name: Neufeld v. Workman
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice to Take Deposition]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Mediation Minute Order]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 25, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 06, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • October 06, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 23, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • August 23, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 23, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.