U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03179
  • Case Name: Jamerson v. Hudson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Traverse]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • October 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • September 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 14, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • September 13, 2022: [Filing Fee Paid]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
  • August 24, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.